FL H0827 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Andrew J. Capeletti Memorial Ramp, Jose Regueiro Avenue, Manuel Capo Boulevard, Lt. Colonel Charles Brown Memorial Highway, Cuban-American Association of Civil Engineers Way, Biscayne Park Way, Dr. Oscar Elias Biscet Boulevard, Father Gerard Jean-Juste Street, Rev. Max Salvador Avenue, Miss Lillie Williams Street, John Torrese Family Road, and Manuel Capo Way in Miami-Dade County, etc.
Title
Road Designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0992 - Passage (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01085; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01085; CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 01085 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01008; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01008 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00661 | |
2010-04-09 | CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00653; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-07 | CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00655 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-15 | CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00277; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00300 | |
2010-03-10 | CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00279 | |
2010-03-08 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00075 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1876 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H1195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H1195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)