FL H0321 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)

Summary

Designates Veterans Memorial Highway & Sergeant Ricky Lord Road in Gilchrist County & Anthony J. Perez Street, Orange Bowl Way, John Torrese Family Road, Manuel Capo Way, Manuel Capo Boulevard, & Lt. Colonel Charles Brown Memorial Highway in Miami-Dade County; revises designation of Jose A. Marques Boulevard in Miami-Dade County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road Designations [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-21 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00841
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00625; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00625
2010-04-15 Withdrawn from Transportation -SJ 00593; Substituted for CS/SB 1026 -SJ 00593; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593
2010-04-14 Received -SJ 00576; Referred to Transportation -SJ 00576
2010-03-24 In Messages
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00365; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00365; CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00366
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00330; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00330
2010-03-08 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00225
2010-03-04 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220
2010-03-03 CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00221
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00033; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00165; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00165; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-01-13 Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2009-11-20 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-11-06 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
H1033 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-233; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
S0322 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0827 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback