FL S0322 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Orange Bowl Way in Miami Lakes. Directs the Department of Transportation to erect markers.
Title
Street Designations/Orange Bowl Way [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation -SJ 00031 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-10-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1033 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-233; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885