FL S1026 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Veterans Memorial Highway and Sergeant Ricky Lord Road in Gilchrist County. Designates Anthony J. Perez Street in Miami-Dade County. Designates the Kenneth H. "Buddy" MacKay and Jim H. Williams Memorial Bridge in Ocala. Directs the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers.
Title
Road and Bridge Designations [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00526 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by- Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00526; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00538 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation -SJ 00073 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-12-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)