FL H0839 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Kenneth H. "Buddy" MacKay & Jim H. Williams Bridge & Otis Beckford Memorial Highway in Marion County; designates Michael G. Rippe Parkway in Lee County; designates Doolittle Raiders Highway in Okaloosa & Walton Counties; designates Beach Highway in Walton County; designates Seminole Way in Seminole County; designates Judge Perry Wells Highway & Vernon Bridge in Washington County, etc.
Title
Road and Bridge Designations
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Aubuchon [R] | Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Denise Grimsley [R] | Rep. Kurt Kelly [R] |
Rep. Yolly Roberson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00661 | |
2010-04-09 | CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00653; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-07 | CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00655 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-16 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00300 | |
2010-03-15 | CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00277; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-10 | CS by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00280 | |
2010-03-08 | On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:30 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00076 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2054 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)