FL S0520 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Doolittle Raiders Highway in Okaloosa and Walton Counties. Designates Beach Highway in Walton County. Designates Command Sergeant Major Gary Lee Littrell Medal of Honor Causeway and Bridge in Pinellas County. Designates Perdido Key Parkway in Escambia County. Designates Andrew J. Capeletti Memorial Ramp in Miami-Dade County. Directs the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.
Title
Road, Bridge, and Building Designations [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585 | |
2010-04-12 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00526 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by- Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00526; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00529 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation -SJ 00042 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-10-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0827 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0841 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H1033 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-233; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
H1195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0088 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0322 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0868 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
S1266 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1610 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1744 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1876 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885
S2054 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S2076 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0827 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0841 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H1033 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-233; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
H1195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0088 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0322 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0868 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
S1266 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1610 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1744 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1876 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885
S2054 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S2076 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)