FL H0005 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)

Summary

Designates Doolittle Raiders Highway in Okaloosa & Walton Counties; designates Beach Highway in Walton County; designates Command Sergeant Major Gary Littrell Medal of Honor Causeway & Bridge in Pinellas County; designates Perdido Key Parkway in Escambia County; designates Andrew J. Capeletti Memorial Ramp & Jose Regueiro Avenue in Miami-Dade County; directs Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road, Bridge, and Building Designations [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
2010-05-28 Approved by Governor
2010-05-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-29 Concurred -HJ 01265, -HJ 01279; Passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01279; Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01279
2010-04-21 In returning messages
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00624; Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00624
2010-04-15 Withdrawn from Transportation -SJ 00585; Substituted for CS/SB 520 -SJ 00585; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Amendment(s) adopted (692070, 478436, 468486, 215982, 155444) -SJ 00588
2010-04-14 Received -SJ 00575; Referred to Transportation -SJ 00575
2010-03-24 In Messages
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00362; Passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00362
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00329
2010-03-03 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00207
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00010; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00164; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00164; On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 01/12/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall; Favorable by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00165; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00165; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-01-15 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-12 Favorable by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-01-05 On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 01/12/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2009-11-04 Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
2009-10-28 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H
2009-10-01 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-05-28 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0088 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0520 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00585; Substituted HB 5 -SJ 00585; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229) -SJ 00585
H0029 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H0321 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-232; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H0643 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0827 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H0839 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0841 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
H1033 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-233; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232)
H1113 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Substituted CS/SB 2054; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -HJ 00937
H1195 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0322 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0868 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1026 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00593; Amendment(s) adopted (388354, 381500, 102182) -SJ 00593; Substituted CS/HB 321 -SJ 00593; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232) -SJ 00593
S1266 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1610 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1698 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Amendment(s) adopted (835946) -SJ 00328; Substituted CS/CS/HB 29 -SJ 00328; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -SJ 00328
S1744 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1876 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1948 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1033 -SJ 00885; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233) -SJ 00885
S2054 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-229; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S2076 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
058561Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback