NY A03499 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - amended on third reading 3499b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - amended on third reading 3499b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires automobile brokers to maintain a place of business; requires certain notices and recordkeeping; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires automobile brokers to maintain a place of business; requires certain notices and recordkeeping; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3499b |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.93 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 3499a |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.442 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07553 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION