US SB4537 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECOVERY Act Reinvigorating the Economy, Creating Opportunity for every Vocation, Employer, Retiree & Youth Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECOVERY Act Reinvigorating the Economy, Creating Opportunity for every Vocation, Employer, Retiree & Youth Act

Sponsors

Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB621 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2108 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3972 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB6258 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6260 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6338 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6580 (Related) 2020-04-21 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6691 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6829 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7017 (Related) 2020-05-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7615 (Related) 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7676 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7786 (Related) 2020-07-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7812 (Related) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7928 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB8143 (Related) 2020-09-01 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB92 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB157 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1030 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2161 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3545 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3546 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3597 (Related) 2020-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB3694 (Related) 2020-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3722 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3769 (Related) 2020-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3821 (Related) 2020-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4101 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB4106 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4214 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4266 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4284 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4297 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4317 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4340 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4376 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4505 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects

Academic performance and assessments
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
American Samoa
Appropriations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Department of Energy
Disability assistance
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Economic performance and conditions
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employment taxes
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Federal preemption
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Hospital care
Immunology and vaccination
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Industrial policy and productivity
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Legal fees and court costs
Legislative rules and procedure
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Middle East
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Oil and gas
Product safety and quality
Religion
Self-employed
Small business
Social security and elderly assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Special education
State and local finance
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Strategic materials and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
Virgin Islands
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback