US HB8832 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To lessen the burdens on interstate commerce by discouraging insubstantial lawsuits relating to COVID-19 while preserving the ability of individuals and businesses that have suffered real injury to obtain complete relief.
Title
SAFE TO WORK Act Safeguarding America’s Frontline Employees To Offer Work Opportunities Required to Kickstart the Economy Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-12-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-12-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-12-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4317 (Same As) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Federal preemption
Federal-Indian relations
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial procedure and administration
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality
Self-employed
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Evidence and witnesses
Federal district courts
Federal preemption
Federal-Indian relations
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Judicial procedure and administration
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Product safety and quality
Self-employed
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8832/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8832/BILLS-116hr8832ih.pdf |