US SB4284 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of Education (ED) to establish an emergency education freedom grant program to assistance families with education expenses and prevent closures of private schools. It also allows tax credits for contributions to scholarship-granting organizations that provide assistance to families for private school tuition and home-schooling expenses. The Department of the Treasury, in coordination with ED, must establish, host, and maintain a web portal that lists all eligible scholarship-granting programs and provides other specified information.
Title
School Choice Now Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1434 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4505 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4505 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
Subjects
American Samoa
Corporate finance and management
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Guam
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Corporate finance and management
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Guam
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4284/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4284/BILLS-116s4284is.pdf |