US HB1434 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 110-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individual and corporate taxpayers a tax credit for cash contributions to tax-exempt scholarship-granting organizations for elementary and secondary education expenses. It imposes a cap of $5 billion on the amount of contributions that qualify for a tax credit. The bill directs the Department of Education, in coordination with the Department of the Treasury, to establish, host, and maintain a web portal that (1) lists all eligible scholarship-granting organizations; (2) enables contributions to such organizations; (3) provides information about the benefits of this bill; and (4) enables a state to submit and update information about its programs and scholarship-granting organizations, including information on student eligibility and allowable educational expenses.
Title
Education Freedom Scholarships and Opportunity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB634 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4284 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8100 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4505 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4284 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8100 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4505 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1434/BILLS-116hr1434ih.pdf |