US SB4505 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to establish a program to make one-time direct payments to parents or guardians to offset the educational expenses of their children during the period of March 2020 to June 2021. It also directs Treasury to award emergency education freedom grants to states. The bill establishes a new tax credit for contributions to an eligible scholarship-granting organization. An eligible scholarship-granting organization is an tax-exempt organization that provides scholarships to individual elementary and secondary school students who reside in the state in which the organization is recognized or are members of a federally recognized Indian tribe. The organization must allocate at least 90% of contributions to qualifying scholarships on an annual basis and provide such scholarships to eligible students and families.
Title
Coronavirus Emergency Education Grants Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4284 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1434 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1434 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
American Samoa
Corporate finance and management
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Guam
Higher education
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Special education
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
American Samoa
Corporate finance and management
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Guam
Higher education
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Special education
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4505/BILLS-116s4505is.pdf |