US SB2161 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a reciprocal marketing approval process that allows for the sale of a drug, biological product, or medical device that has not been approved by the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) if the product is approved for sale in another country and there is an unmet need. Specifically, the bill requires the product's sponsor to demonstrate, among other things, that their product has been approved in one of the specified countries, the FDA and listed countries have not withdrawn approval because of safety or effectiveness concerns, and there is a public health or unmet medical need for the product. The FDA may only decline approval if the FDA determines that the product is not safe or effective. The FDA must make such a determination not later than 30 days after receiving a request. Congress may pass a joint resolution to grant reciprocal marketing approval of a product that the FDA declines to approve through the reciprocal process.
Title
Reciprocity Ensures Streamlined Use of Lifesaving Treatments Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6260 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6258 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB3545 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6258 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB3545 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2161/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2161/BILLS-116s2161is.pdf |