US SB4317 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to lessen the burdens on interstate commerce by discouraging insubstantial lawsuits relating to COVID-19 while preserving the ability of individuals and businesses that have suffered real injury to obtain complete relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE TO WORK Act Safeguarding America’s Frontline Employees To Offer Work Opportunities Required to Kickstart the Economy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
HB8832 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback