US HR535 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2467) to require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to designate per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances as hazardous substances under the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2668) to amend the Federal Trade Commission Act to affirmatively confirm the authority of the Federal Trade Commission to seek permanent injunctions and other equitable relief for violations of any provision of law enforced by the Commission; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3985) to amend the Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2009 to expedite the special immigrant visa process for certain Afghan allies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2467) to require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to designate per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances as hazardous substances under the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2668) to amend the Federal Trade Commission Act to affirmatively confirm the authority of the Federal Trade Commission to seek permanent injunctions and other equitable relief for violations of any provision of law enforced by the Commission; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3985) to amend the Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2009 to expedite the special immigrant visa process for certain Afghan allies, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-20 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 216 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 219 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-07-20HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 208 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR H3708)
2021-07-20HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 207 (Roll no. 210).
2021-07-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 535.
2021-07-20HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3708-3715)
2021-07-19HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
2021-07-19HouseThe resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2467, H.R. 2668 and H.R. 3985. The resolution provides en bloc suspension authority and provides at any time through the legislative day of Thursday, July 22, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or a designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of July 19 or 20, 2021, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed.
2021-07-19HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-95, by Ms. Ross.

Same As/Similar To

HB2467 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR535 (Similar To) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2668 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate.
HB3985 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Received in the Senate.
HB678 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1036 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1079 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1158 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1250 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1754 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1833 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1850 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1871 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1877 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1893 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1895 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2118 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2795 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2928 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2980 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3003 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3138 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3223 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3263 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB3264 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR277 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3729)
HR294 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3729)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback