US HB2928 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to establish a voluntary Cyber Sense program to test the cybersecurity of products and technologies intended for use in the bulk-power system, and for other purposes.
Title
Cyber Sense Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3721-3722) |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 2928 are considered vacated. |
2021-07-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2928. |
2021-07-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3641-3642; text: CR H3641) |
2021-07-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 66. |
2021-07-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-92. |
2021-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Subcommittee on Energy Discharged. |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2199 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2199 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.