US HB1754 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to require the Federal Communications Commission to consider market entry barriers for socially disadvantaged individuals in the communications marketplace report under section 13 of such Act.
Title
MEDIA Diversity Act of 2021 Measuring the Economics Driving Investments and Access for Diversity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3718) |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 1754 are considered vacated. |
2021-07-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1754. |
2021-07-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3644; text: CR H3644) |
2021-07-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.