US HB3985 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 105-36)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2009 to expedite the special immigrant visa process for certain Afghan allies, and for other purposes.
Title
ALLIES Act of 2021 Averting Loss of Life and Injury by Expediting SIVs Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-22 - House - On passage (Y: 407 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-07-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-22 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 407 - 16 (Roll no. 218). (text: CR H3807) |
2021-07-22 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-07-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3985. |
2021-07-22 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2467, H.R. 2668 and H.R. 3985. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2467, H.R. 2668 and H.R. 3985. The resolution provides en bloc suspension authority and provides at any time through the legislative day of Thursday, July 22, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or a designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of July 19 or 20, 2021, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed. |
2021-07-22 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 535. (consideration: CR H3807-3817) |
2021-07-20 | House | Rule H. Res. 535 passed House. |
2021-07-19 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 535 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2467, H.R. 2668 and H.R. 3985. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 2467, H.R. 2668 and H.R. 3985. The resolution provides en bloc suspension authority and provides at any time through the legislative day of Thursday, July 22, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or a designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of July 19 or 20, 2021, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5134 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5134 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.