US HB678 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for a moratorium on number reassignment after a disaster declaration, and for other purposes.
Title
PHONE Act of 2021 Preserving Home and Office Numbers in Emergencies Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3716) |
2021-07-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 678 are considered vacated. |
2021-07-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-07-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 678. |
2021-07-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3647-3650; text: CR H3647-3648) |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.