CA SB1248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 33355 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: extreme weather conditions: physical activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3466.) (April 3). |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33355 | New Code | See Bill Text |