MO SB897 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3759S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3759S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to judicial proceedings
Title
Modifies provisions relating to judicial proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3759S.04C) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |