CA AB2998 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on August 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 49414.35 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Opioid overdose reversal medications: pupil administration.
Sponsors
Asm. Tina McKinnor [D] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Asm. Pilar Schiavo [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-19 - Assembly - AB 2998 McKinnor Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2998 McKinnor et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2998 McKinnor Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2998 McKinnor et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2998 McKinnor Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49414.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |