LA HB966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB696
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes unitization for carbon dioxide sequestration
Title
Authorizes unitization for carbon dioxide sequestration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 966 ADOPT (#1410) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 966 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1645) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 966 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1645) (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 966 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1385) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#1066) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 AMENDMENT # 3037 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#538) (Y: 28 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 966 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1645) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 966 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1645) (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 966 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1385) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#1066) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 FINAL PASSAGE (#539) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 966 AMENDMENT # 3037 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#538) (Y: 28 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 645. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2024-05-30 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 7. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2024-05-28 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-28 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Hensgens, and Seabaugh. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2024-05-23 | House | House conferees appointed: Geymann, Riser, and Jacob Landry. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2024-05-23 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 696 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB696 (Replaces) 2024-04-10 - Becomes HB 966.