CA AB1963 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 14085) to Chapter 3 of Division 7 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: paraquat dichloride prohibition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14085 | New Code | See Bill Text |