IL SB3430 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to develop, post, and maintain on its official website a comprehensive informational guide that explains the Medicaid 5-year look-back period as it applies to eligibility for long-term care coverage under the medical assistance program. Provides that the informational guide must be posted within 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the contents of the informational guide must include a detailed explanation of the 5-year look-back period, including its purpose and relevance to eligibility for medical assistance; clear information on how the 5-year look-back period affects eligibility criteria, including income and asset requirements; step-by-step guidance on how the 5-year look-back period is calculated, including the start date and end date considerations; explanation of the consequences and implications of transfers or gifts made during the 5-year look-back period; information on exceptions and exemptions to the 5-year look-back period, clarifying circumstances where certain transfers or assets may not be subject to scrutiny; guidance on the documentation individuals may need to provide or maintain to demonstrate compliance with the 5-year look-back period; tips and considerations for individuals and families on how to plan for eligibility for medical assistance, taking into account the 5-year look-back period; information on the process for appeals and dispute resolution related to decisions made based on the 5-year look-back period; and other matters. Provides that to ensure user-friendly navigation and visibility, the Department shall post on the main page of its official website detailed information on how users can easily access the comprehensive guide on the website and a hyperlink that directs users to the comprehensive guide. Requires the Department to develop and implement strategies and initiatives to promote awareness and utilization of the guide, including outreach efforts through community organizations, healthcare providers, and other relevant channels.
Title
DHFS-MEDICAID-LOOK-BACK PERIOD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0997 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |