US HB1895 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to analyze the preparedness of the U.S. transportation security system for public health threats. Additionally, the TSA may provide its personnel to other components of the Department of Homeland Security and other federal agencies to improve coordination with such components and agencies to prepare for, protect against, and respond to public health threats to the transportation security system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Security Public Health Threat Preparedness Act of 2021 Transportation Security Public Health Threat Preparedness Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2021-07-20HousePursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3720-3721)
2021-07-20HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 1895 are considered vacated.
2021-07-20HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1895.
2021-07-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3684-3685; text: CR H3684-3685)
2021-07-20HouseMs. Barragan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-04-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 13.
2021-04-30HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-26.
2021-03-18HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-18HouseSubcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1605 (Related) 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-81. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback