CA SB980 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14132.88 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: dental crowns and implants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3380.) (March 20). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |