US HB1833 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (CISA) to maintain certain capabilities to identify and address threats to industrial control systems. Specifically, the bill requires CISA's National Cybersecurity and Communications Integration Center to ensure that its activities address the security of both information and operational technology, including industrial control systems. Additionally, CISA must maintain capabilities to identify and address threats and vulnerabilities to products and technologies intended for use in the automated control of critical infrastructure processes by (1) leading efforts to identify and mitigate cybersecurity threats to industrial control systems; (2) maintaining threat hunting and incident response capabilities to respond to cybersecurity risks and incidents; (3) providing cybersecurity technical assistance to stakeholders; and (4) collecting, coordinating, and providing vulnerability information to the industrial control systems community. CISA shall provide to the homeland security committees a briefing on its industrial control systems capabilities at specified intervals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Industrial Control Systems Capabilities Enhancement Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2021-07-20HousePursuant to section 7 of H. Res. 535, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 678; H.R. 1036; H.R. 1079, as amended; H.R. 1158; H.R. 1250; H.R. 1754; H.R. 1833, as amended; H.R. 1850; H.R. 1871; H.R. 1877, as amended; H.R. 1893; H.R. 1895; H.R. 2118; H.R. 2795, as amended; H.R. 2928; H.R. 2980, as amended; H.R. 3003; H.R. 3138, as amended; H.R. 3223; H.R. 3263; and H.R. 3264; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 277; and H. Res. 294. (consideration: CR H3715-3730; text: CR H3718)
2021-07-20HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 535, proceedings on H.R. 1833 are considered vacated.
2021-07-20HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1833.
2021-07-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3695-3696; text: H3695)
2021-07-20HouseMs. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-03-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-18HouseSubcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR535 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback