US SB2439 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide for the responsibility of the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency to maintain capabilities to identify threats to industrial control systems, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Industrial Control Systems Capabilities Enhancement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631. |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment. With written report No. 117-247. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1833 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.