US HB2825 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Authorization Act Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Headquarters, which shall, among other things: (1) establish an overall strategy to successfully further the mission of DHS, and (2) ensure that DHS successfully meets operational and management performance objectives. The bill: (1) sets forth the responsibilities of Chief Privacy Officer, the Chief Financial Officer, and the Chief Information Officer of DHS; (2) establishes the positions of Chief Procurement Officer and Chief Security Officer; and (3) includes acquisition management with the responsibilities of the Under Secretary for Management. DHS must establish an Acquisition Review Board to: (1) strengthen accountability and uniformity within the DHS acquisition review process, (2) review major acquisition programs, and (3) review the use of best practices. DHS must adopt, and report on, a multiyear acquisition strategy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Authorization Act Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 386 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
2018-04-16SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-03-07SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-02-07SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
2017-07-20SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2017-07-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-20HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 41 (Roll no. 403). (text: CR H6047-6109)
2017-07-20HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6128)
2017-07-20HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-07-20HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2825.
2017-07-20HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6047-6120)
2017-07-20HouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-06-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
2017-06-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-198.
2017-06-14HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
2017-06-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2017-06-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2427 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2442 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2453 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1249 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1252 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1282 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1294 (Related) 2017-03-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB1297 (Related) 2017-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB886 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Held at the desk.
SB887 (Related) 2017-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2428-2430; text of measure as introduced: CR S2428-2430)
SB902 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB906 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Held at the desk.
HB2132 (Related) 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2188 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
SB1847 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
HB2922 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
HB2605 (Related) 2017-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2548 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
SB2262 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2470 (Related) 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Advisory bodies
Alaska
Arctic and polar regions
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Coast guard
Community life and organization
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Land transfers
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Minnesota
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Pipelines
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Railroads
Religion
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Service animals
Sex offenses
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback