US HB2922 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PREPARE Act Promoting Resilience and Efficiency in Preparing for Attacks and Responding to Emergencies Act This bill revises programs and activities of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), the Office of Emergency Communications of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), and the Office of Health Affairs of DHS. Specifically, the bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to: revise requirements for and reauthorize the Urban Area Security Initiative, require states receiving homeland security grants to submit to FEMA certain threat and risk assessments, expand the allowable uses of homeland security grant funds to include enhancing medical preparedness and cybersecurity, require FEMA to implement a uniform process for using grant funds to purchase certain equipment or systems, update the National Incident Management System at least once every five years, expand requirements relating to cyber preparedness, require FEMA to establish a major metropolitan area counterterrorism training and exercise grant program, revise duties of the Chief Medical Officer of DHS, and require DHS to establish a medical countermeasures program. DHS may establish a Rural Domestic Preparedness Consortium to provide training to emergency response providers from rural communities. FEMA must provide updates on the management of the Chemical, Ordnance, Biological, and Radiological Training Facility of the Center for Domestic Preparedness. DHS may not implement the National Preparedness Grant Program or change the location or reporting structure of the Office of Emergency Communications without prior authorization from Congress. FEMA must: (1) designate a chief management official for the agency, (2) report on efforts to modernize its grants and financial information technology systems, and (3) update its strategic human capital plan in 2018 and the next five succeeding years.
Title
PREPARE Act Promoting Resilience and Efficiency in Preparing for Attacks and Responding to Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications. |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB437 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB687 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2188 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB437 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB687 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2188 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Department of Homeland Security
Drug therapy
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homeland security
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Radiation
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Department of Homeland Security
Drug therapy
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homeland security
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Radiation
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2922/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2922/BILLS-115hr2922ih.pdf |