US HB2188 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Counterterrorism Preparedness Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to carry out a grant program for emergency response providers to prevent, prepare for, and respond to emerging terrorist attack scenarios in major metropolitan areas. DHS shall provide to eligible applicants: (1) unclassified information on such scenarios, and (2) information on training and exercises best practices. Jurisdictions that receive funding under the Urban Area Security Initiative may apply for such a grant. Eligible applicants receiving funding under the program may include in funded activities neighboring jurisdictions that would be likely to provide mutual aid in response in such scenarios. Recipients may use grants to: identify capability gaps related to preparing for, preventing, and responding to such scenarios; develop or update plans, annexes, and processes to address such gaps; conduct training and exercises to address such gaps; and conduct exercises, including at locations such as mass gathering venues, places of worship, or educational institutions, as appropriate, to validate capabilities. DHS shall aggregate, analyze, and share with relevant emergency response providers information on best practices and lessons learned from: (1) the planning, training, and exercises conducted using program grants; and (2) responses to actual terrorist attacks around the world.
Title
Community Counterterrorism Preparedness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122. |
2017-06-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-181. |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB2922 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
HB2922 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Subjects
Crime prevention
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Terrorism
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Violent crime