US HB3359 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to redesignate the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) National Protection and Programs Directorate as the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency. It transfers resources and responsibilities of the directorate to the agency. The agency shall be headed by the Director of National Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security. Its responsibilities shall include: leading cybersecurity and critical infrastructure security programs, operations, and associated policy; and carrying out DHS's responsibilities concerning chemical facility antiterrorism standards. The bill details the organizational structure of the agency. (Sec. 3) The bill transfers within DHS the Office of Biometric Identity Management to the Management Directorate. It also requires DHS to transfer the Federal Protective Service to an appropriate DHS component, directorate, or office following the completion of an ongoing Government Accountability Office review. (Sec. 4) DHS shall report on its leadership role in cloud-based cybersecurity deployments for civilian federal departments and agencies.
Title
Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-278. |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9501-9506) |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Mr. McCaul asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9501-9506) |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.4043 Amendment SA 4043 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.4044 Amendment SA 4044 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.4044 Amendment SA 4044 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Murkowski to Amendment SA 4043. (consideration: CR S6503) To improve the amendment. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.4043 Amendment SA 4043 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S6503) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6503) |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9761-9765) |
2017-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3359. |
2017-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9761-9768) |
2017-12-11 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336. |
2017-12-11 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2017-12-11 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2017-12-11 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2017-12-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-454, Part I. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
Subjects
Chemistry
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Infrastructure development
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Right of privacy
Terrorism
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Firearms and explosives
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Infrastructure development
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Right of privacy
Terrorism