US SB1847 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security for Children Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) Office of Strategy, Policy, and Plans to review and incorporate into DHS policy feedback from organizations representing the needs of children. (Sec. 3) The bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to identify and integrate the needs of children into activities to prepare for, protect against, respond to, recover from, and mitigate against the risk of natural disasters, acts of terrorism, and other man-made disasters, including by appointing a technical expert to coordinate such integration.
Title
Homeland Security for Children Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-202. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5865; text of measure as introduced: CR S5865-5866) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1372 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism