US HB1372 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Homeland Security for Children Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act to include among the functions of the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) Office of Strategy, Policy, and Plans to review and incorporate into DHS policy feedback from organizations representing the needs of children. (Sec. 3) The bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to identify and integrate the needs of children into activities to prepare for, protect against, respond to, recover from, and mitigate against the risk of natural disasters, acts of terrorism, and other man-made disasters, including by appointing a technical expert to coordinate such integration.
Title
Homeland Security for Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2828) |
2017-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1372. |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2828-2829) |
2017-04-25 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52. |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-92, Part I. |
2017-03-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1847 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism