US HB1297 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Quadrennial Homeland Security Review Technical Corrections Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make technical corrections regarding quadrennial homeland security reviews. The bill includes among the entities with whom the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) is required to consult in conducting each review appropriate advisory committees established pursuant to such Act or otherwise, including the Homeland Security Advisory Council, the Homeland Security Science and Technology Advisory Committee, and the Aviation Security Advisory Committee. DHS's outline and prioritization of the full range of critical homeland security mission areas of the nation for each review must be based on a risk assessment of the nation's homeland security interests. Each review shall include a description of: (1) the resources required for the homeland security program (currently, a budget plan for such program); and (2) the resources required to execute the missions called for in the homeland security strategy and the homeland security mission areas (currently, a budget plan for such resources), including any resources identified from redundant, wasteful, or unnecessary capabilities and capacities that may be redirected to better support other existing capabilities and capacities, as the case may be. DHS must submit the report on each review within 60 days after the date of submission of the President's budget for the fiscal year after the fiscal year in which such a review is required (currently by December 31 of the year in which the review is conducted). The bill repeals requirements that DHS review and assess the effectiveness of the mechanisms of DHS for executing the process of turning the requirements developed in each review into an acquisition strategy and expenditure plan. But DHS must provide information on the degree to which the findings and recommendations developed in each review were integrated into DHS's acquisition strategy and expenditure plans. DHS must retain and, upon request, provide specified documentation regarding each review, including: (1) records regarding the consultation carried out; and (2) information regarding such risk assessment of the nation's homeland security interests. This bill shall apply to each quadrennial homeland security review conducted after December 31, 2021.
Title
Quadrennial Homeland Security Review Technical Corrections Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 181 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 181). (text: CR 3/20/2017 H2215) |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2276-2277) |
2017-03-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-03-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1297. |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2215-2216) |
2017-03-20 | House | Mr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21. |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-41. |
2017-03-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public contracts and procurement