US HB2132 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Traveler Redress Improvement Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to ensure the availability of the Department of Homeland Security Traveler Redress Inquiry Program (DHS TRIP) redress process to adjudicate inquiries for individuals who: are U.S. citizens or aliens lawfully admitted for permanent residence, have filed an inquiry with DHS TRIP after receiving enhanced screening at an airport security checkpoint more than three times in a 60-day period, and believe they have been wrongly identified as being a threat to aviation security. TSA shall review and update the Privacy Impact Assessment for the Secure Flight programs for accuracy and make such assessment available to the public on TSA's website. TSA shall also review its intelligence-based screening rules, notify specified federal agencies of any rule changes, and ensure such rules are incorporated in the risk analysis conducted during the Federal Air Marshal mission scheduling process. The Government Accountability Office shall: study the effectiveness of such rules in identifying and mitigating potential threats to aviation security; and examine coordination between the TSA, DHS, and other relevant partners relating to changing, updating, implementing, or suspending such rules as necessary.
Title
Traveler Redress Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-06-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4975) |
2017-06-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2132. |
2017-06-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4975-4976) |
2017-06-20 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2825 (Related) 2018-11-13 - By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-351.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Law enforcement officers
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Administrative remedies
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Law enforcement officers
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security