US HB2556 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CONNECT for Health Act of 2017 Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies for Health Act of 2017
Title
CONNECT for Health Act of 2017 Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies for Health Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB431 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1016 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3482 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1016 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3482 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2556/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2556/BILLS-115hr2556ih.pdf |