US SB1016 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CONNECT for Health Act of 2017 Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies (CONNECT) for Health Act of 2017
Title
CONNECT for Health Act of 2017 Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies (CONNECT) for Health Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Luther Strange [R-AL] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB431 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2556 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3482 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2556 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3482 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Indian social and development programs
Internet and video services
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1016/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1016/BILLS-115s1016is.pdf |