US SB431 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Furthering Access to Stroke Telemedicine Act This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to specify that certain siting requirements applicable under the Medicare program shall not apply to telehealth services that are furnished after 2017 for purposes of evaluating an acute stroke. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services shall not pay an originating-site facility fee with respect to such telehealth services.
Title
Furthering Access to Stroke Telemedicine Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1016 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2556 (Related) 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1016 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2556 (Related) 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Neurological disorders
User charges and fees
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Neurological disorders
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/431/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s431/BILLS-115s431is.pdf |