US HB4579 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating High-Quality Results and Outcomes Necessary to Improve Chronic (CHRONIC) Care Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to: extend the Independence at Home demonstration program; modify provisions regarding access to home dialysis therapy under Medicare and special needs plans under Medicare Advantage (MA); expand testing of the MA Value-Based Insurance Design test model; allow an MA plan to provide additional telehealth benefits to enrollees and, to chronically ill enrollees, certain supplemental health care benefits; modify other provisions regarding the use of telehealth services; allow prospective, voluntary assignment of Medicare fee-for-service beneficiaries to accountable care organizations (ACOs); allow ACOs to operate beneficiary incentive programs; require the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to establish a process for Medicare prescription-drug plan sponsors to request certain claims data from the CMS; require the CMS to study and report to Congress on long-term risk factors for chronic conditions among Medicare beneficiaries; and eliminate annual funding available to the Medicare Improvement Fund and the Medicaid Improvement Fund beginning in FY2021. The Government Accountability Office shall conduct studies on: the establishment of a payment code for a visit for longitudinal comprehensive care planning services, the extent to which Medicare prescription drug plans and private payors use programs that synchronize pharmacy dispensing to facilitate comprehensive counseling and promote medication adherence, and the use of prescription drugs to manage the weight of obese patients and the impact of such drug coverage on patient health and health care spending.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating High-Quality Results and Outcomes Necessary to Improve Chronic (CHRONIC) Care Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1995 (Related) 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3044 (Related) 2017-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3168 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
HB3263 (Related) 2017-12-06 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-446, Part I.
HB3447 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB431 (Related) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback