US HB3447 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FACTS Act of 2017 Furthering Access to Coordinated Treatment for Seniors Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to allow Medicare prescription drug plan (PDP) sponsors to access certain Medicare claims data. Specifically, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) must establish a process for PDP sponsors to request, beginning in plan year 2020, standardized extracts of claims data for Medicare hospital and medical services. PDP sponsors may use such data: (1) to optimize therapeutic outcomes through improved medication use, (2) to improve care coordination so as to prevent adverse health outcomes, or (3) for any other purpose determined appropriate by the CMS. PDP sponsors may not, however, use such data: (1) to inform coverage determinations; (2) to conduct retroactive reviews of medically accepted indications determinations; (3) to direct enrollment changes; (4) to inform marketing of benefits; or (5) for certain other purposes affecting the security of personal health information, as determined by the CMS.
Title
FACTS Act of 2017 Furthering Access to Coordinated Treatment for Seniors Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Drug therapy
Health
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
Health
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3447/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3447/BILLS-115hr3447ih.pdf |