US HB1995 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
V-BID for Better Care Act of 2017 Value-Based Insurance Design for Better Care Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to require the Center for Medicare & Medicaid Innovation to expand testing of a model of Medicare Advantage (MA) value-based insurance design that allows MA plans to propose and design benefit structures that vary benefits, cost-sharing, and supplemental benefits with respect to enrollees who have specific chronic diseases. The test model (initially being carried out in specified states) shall be expanded to all states, and may not be terminated prior to 2022.
Title
V-BID for Better Care Act of 2017 Value-Based Insurance Design for Better Care Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1995/BILLS-115hr1995ih.pdf |