US HB3168 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SNP Reauthorization Act of 2017 Special Needs Plans Reauthorization Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill allows a Medicare Advantage (MA) plan, until 2024, to restrict plan enrollment to certain special-needs individuals, provided that the plan meets specified applicable requirements. Current law allows an MA plan to do so until 2019. The Federal Coordinated Health Care Office within the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) shall serve as a dedicated point of contact for states with regard to special-needs MA plans for individuals who are dually eligible for Medicaid and Medicare. The CMS shall establish a unified process for grievances and appeals for individuals enrolled in such plans. The CMS must, with respect to special-needs MA plans for individuals with chronic conditions, convene a panel of clinical advisors to establish and update the list of chronic conditions that make an individual eligible for participation in such a plan. The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must study and report to Congress on health outcomes of individuals enrolled in specialized MA plans. The CMS shall, with respect to special-needs MA plans, consider applying certain quality measures at the plan level rather than at the contract level. The GAO must report to Congress on state-level integration between the Medicaid program and special-needs MA plans for individuals who are dually eligible for Medicaid and Medicare. (Sec. 3) Beginning in plan year 2020, an MA plan may provide certain supplemental benefits to chronically ill enrollees. The GAO must report to Congress on the provision of such supplemental benefits to MA enrollees.
Title
SNP Reauthorization Act of 2017 Special Needs Plans Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353. |
2017-12-21 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2017-12-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-478, Part I. |
2017-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3044 (Related) 2017-07-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4820 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4579 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4820 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and paralysis
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and paralysis
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Medicare