US HB3263 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-446, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend the Medicare independence at home medical practice demonstration program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend the Medicare independence at home medical practice demonstration program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-446, Part I.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-13HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2017-09-13HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB870 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback