US HB3482 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Evidence-Based Telehealth Expansion Act of 2017
Title
Evidence-Based Telehealth Expansion Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2556 (Related) 2017-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1016 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1016 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3482/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3482/BILLS-115hr3482ih.pdf |