MA S943 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to injuries to law enforcement personnel by drivers under the influence of alcohol. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to injuries to law enforcement personnel by drivers under the influence of alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S558 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1307 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1257 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S832 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1129 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1131 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1409 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
H2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S40 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - New draft substituted, see S2038
S558 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1307 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1257 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S832 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1244 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1129 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1131 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1409 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S660 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2102
H2199 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S40 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - New draft substituted, see S2038
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S943 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S943.pdf |