CA AB2297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 127400, 127401, 127405, 127425, 127435, 127436, 127440, 127450, 127452, and 127455 of, and to add Section 127400.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.
Title
Hospital and Emergency Physician Fair Pricing Policies.
Sponsors
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Tina McKinnor [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2297 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2297 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-29 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 12). |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 6.) |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 8). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127400.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127435 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127436 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |