AK SB95 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-14 - MANIFEST ERROR(S) -- SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to special request specialty organization registration plates; relating to special registration plates commemorating peace officers killed in the line of duty; relating to special registration plates for vehicles owned by women veterans; relating to special request registration plates for United States Space Force personnel; relating to the transfer of vehicles; relating to commercial driver's licenses and commercial instruction permits; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates; Comm. Driver Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 95(STA) am Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-14SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S) -- SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
2024-05-15SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2024-05-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-15SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20
2024-05-15SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2024-05-14HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 95(RLS)
2024-05-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2024-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, MINA
2024-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-14HousePASSED Y39 N1
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 95(RLS)
2024-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2024-05-14HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 19
2024-05-14HouseRLS HCS ADOPTED UC
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
2024-05-14HouseFN4: (ADM)
2024-05-14HouseDP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SHAW, ALLARD, TILTON, C.JOHNSON
2024-05-14HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 19
2024-05-14HouseRLS RPT HCS(RLS) NEW TITLE 6DP
2024-05-13HouseHELD TO 5/14 CALENDAR
2024-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RLS RPT/REF
2024-05-09HouseFN3: (ADM)
2024-05-09HouseNR: HANNAN
2024-05-09HouseDP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, JOSEPHSON, GALVIN, STAPP, FOSTER
2024-05-09HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2024-05-09HouseFIN RPT HCS(STA) NEW TITLE 8DP 1NR
2024-03-14HouseFN2: (ADM)
2024-03-14HouseNR: CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD, CARRICK
2024-03-14HouseDP: WRIGHT, STORY, SHAW
2024-03-14HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2024-03-14HouseSTA RPT HCS(STA) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
2024-01-16HouseSTA, FIN
2024-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-05-16SenateVERSION: CSSB 95(STA) AM
2023-05-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2023-05-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2023-05-16SenatePASSED Y18 N1 A1
2023-05-16SenateCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER
2023-05-16SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2023-05-16SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2023-05-16SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2023-05-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 95(STA)
2023-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL
2023-05-15SenateSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2023-05-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-15SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/23
2023-05-12SenateFN1: (ADM)
2023-05-12SenateNR: OLSON
2023-05-12SenateDP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP
2023-05-12SenateFIN RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2023-05-03SenateFN1: (ADM)
2023-05-03SenateDP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, CLAMAN, MERRICK, BJORKMAN
2023-05-03SenateSTA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
2023-04-14SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN
2023-04-11SenateCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2023-03-10SenateCOSPONSOR(S): KIEHL
2023-03-08SenateSTA, FIN
2023-03-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback